U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Prima Exploration, Inc. v. Nova Energy, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • December 23, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • December 14, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 12, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.