U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Floyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2023: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.