U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.