U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Navajo Transitional Energy Company, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 19, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.