U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.