U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Owens et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.