U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandoval-Sandoval
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.