U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schwalbach et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 09, 2024: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2024: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 26, 2024: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2024: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Sentencing - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.