U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Locate Counsel - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Compassionate Release]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.