U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Littlebird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.