U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sieler et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.