U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Don'tMix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.