U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.