U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Borhan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Remark - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • December 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.