U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Hair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.