U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luis Carlos Anchondo-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.