U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Balch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.