U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rider
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2024: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.