U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rhoades
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.