U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.