U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.