U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rochon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • October 03, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.