U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Remark - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Exhibits - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Witness List - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Instructions ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury List]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Notes ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Jury Trial]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Witness List - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.