U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Penny et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 08, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • October 02, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Summons]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.