U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voshell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Suppress ]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.