U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.