U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ball
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.