U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Catalusci et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Arrest ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.