U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lightfoot et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Quash ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Docket Call]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.