U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bacon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.