U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirsch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Jury Instructions ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Letter - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 26, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2024: [Hearing]
  • September 26, 2024: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.