U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-bk-90100-
  • Case Name: Robert Thompson and Jennifer Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Approving Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Enlargement of Time to Seek Dismissal or Denial of Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.