U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-bk-10135-
  • Case Name: MEADOW LARK AGENCY, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Approve Compromise Settlement]
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • March 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Settlement]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Settlement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.