U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Tong et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.