U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.