U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.