U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holbrook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • May 02, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.