U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.