U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anselmi et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.