U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.