U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Metelus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 12, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • February 12, 2025: [Exhibits - MT]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.