U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00090-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Iverson, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 30, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.