U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.