U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:23-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 03, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.