U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lepe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.