U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.