U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Witmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Remark - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.