U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.