U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Labuff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.