U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Littledog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stay - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Transcript - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.